Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01245
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Citiguard Inc.
9301 Corbin Avenue Suite 1800
Northridge, CA 91324
Represented By
Citiguard Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 8:12 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1245 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Monday, February 22, 2021
16 16 notice Notice Mon 02/22 11:36 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/17 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
14 14 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 12/15 4:11 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/15/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, December 04, 2020
13 13 misc Status report Fri 12/04 1:46 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
12 12 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 12:38 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 01, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/01 8:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 30, 2020
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 4:42 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From November 3, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than November 30, 2020 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/30/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Sunday, October 18, 2020
9 9 misc Status report Sun 10/18 12:09 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued,7 Status report, 8 Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document
Thursday, October 15, 2020
8 8 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 10/15 6:33 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] WARNING: Filer to re-file as flattened/locked pdf. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 7 Status report filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
7 7 misc Status report Thu 10/15 7:29 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, September 25, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 09/25 6:30 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/23/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Saturday, September 19, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Sat 09/19 4:54 AM
Proof of service (Amended) of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Amended Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:36 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 9:44 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 3:07 PM
Summons Issued on Citiguard Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 10:28 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01245. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Citiguard Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01245-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1