Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01248
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Apr 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Collecto, Inc.
700 Longwater Drive
Norwell, MA 02061
Represented By
Collecto, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Business Services
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/06 2:30 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1248 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services
23 23 notice Notice Tue 04/06 1:28 PM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 31, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 01/31 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/31/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 29, 2021
21 21 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 01/29 2:25 PM
Order: (1) Finding That Defendant Is Not Entitled To A Jury Trial Before The District Court And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/29/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
20 20 misc Status report Tue 01/19 6:34 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
19 19 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 12:40 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/11 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 11/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 09, 2020
17 17 notice Notice Mon 11/09 5:43 PM
Notice -- Notice Concerning Court's November 9, 2020 Order Continuing November 10, 2020 Status Conference, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Collecto, Inc. Related [+]. (Wong, Christopher K.S.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Continuing Status Conference From November 10, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 11/9/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
16 16 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 11/09 8:38 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 10, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/9/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
15 15 misc Status report Tue 10/27 11:56 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 15, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/15 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/15 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF) Tue 10/13 3:37 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vicere Justin A. Kesselman (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/13/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 order Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF) Tue 10/13 3:34 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice re Dustin F. Hecker (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/13/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, October 09, 2020
10 10 motion Appear pro hac vice (motion) Fri 10/09 10:25 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice -- Application of Non-Resident Attorney Justin A. Kesselman to Appear in a Specific Case [LBR 2090-1(b)], with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Collecto, Inc. (Wong, Christopher K.S.)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear pro hac vice (motion) Fri 10/09 10:22 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice -- Application of Non-Resident Attorney Dustin F. Hecker to Appear in a Specific Case [LBR 2090-1(b)], with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Collecto, Inc. (Wong, Christopher K.S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 09/28 1:00 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: EOS Holdings USA, Inc., EOS Holdings, GmbH. Filed by Defendant Collecto, Inc.. (Wong, Christopher K.S.)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 12:30 PM
Answer to Complaint -- Collecto, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502, with Proof of Service Filed by Collecto, Inc.. (Wong, Christopher K.S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 09/23 2:18 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Wong, Christopher K.S.. (Wong, Christopher K.S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:38 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Saturday, September 12, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Sat 09/12 4:12 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 9:46 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 4:23 PM
Summons Issued on Collecto, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 10:34 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01248. Complaint by Verity Business Services against Collecto, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01248-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1