Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01259
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Mar 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Datex-Ohmeda, Inc.
3030 Ohmeda Drive
Madison, WI 53718
Represented By
Datex-Ohmeda, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
17 17 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/03 11:25 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1259 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
16 16 notice Notice Wed 03/03 8:16 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
15 15 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 11:39 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/27 9:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 25, 2021
13 13 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/25 3:52 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/25/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Wed 01/13 9:35 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
11 11 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 12:44 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 07, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 11/07 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 11/04 8:41 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 10, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/4/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
8 8 misc Status report Tue 10/27 8:19 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 22, 2020
7 7 misc Proof of service Thu 10/22 2:11 PM
Proof of service of Answer Filed by Defendant Datex-Ohmeda, Inc. Related [+].
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaintynolds, Kenneth
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/22 2:09 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Datex-Ohmeda, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Kenneth
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 10/13 9:17 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:45 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 9:53 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:04 PM
Summons Issued on Datex-Ohmeda, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 11:04 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01259. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Datex-Ohmeda, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01259-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639149. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1