Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01267
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Jul 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dynamics Orthotics & Prosthetics, Inc.
1830 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 123
Los Angeles, CA 90006
Represented By
Dynamics Orthotics & Prosthetics, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/21 12:16 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1267 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center,15 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Monday, June 28, 2021
25 25 notice Notice Mon 06/28 12:56 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 06/09 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Monday, June 07, 2021
23 23 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 06/07 9:52 AM
Order continuing status conference from June 8, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. to September 14, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. in view of settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/7/2021 (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
22 22 notice Notice Tue 05/25 8:14 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 18, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/18 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 16, 2021
20 20 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/16 3:56 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Sunday, March 14, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/14 10:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, March 12, 2021
18 18 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 03/12 9:03 AM
Order Granting Stipulation Re: Motion For Entry Of Default Judgment. The deadline for Defendant to file and serve a written opposition to the Motion and request for hearing shall be extended for sixty (60) days and Defendant shall be entitled to file and serve such written opposition and request for hearing on or before May 11, 2021. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/12/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, March 11, 2021
17 17 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 03/11 2:10 PM
Stipulation By Dynamics Orthotics & Prosthetics, Inc. and Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Filed by Defendant Dynamics Orthotics & Prosthetics, Inc. (Nachimson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 02/23 12:10 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, February 18, 2021
15 15 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 02/18 2:29 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, February 05, 2021
14 14 misc Withdrawal re: Fri 02/05 3:34 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice Of Withdrawal of Docket Number 13 Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 13 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Thursday, February 04, 2021
13 13 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 02/04 5:52 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Dynamics Orthotics & Prosthetics, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 12:01 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
10 10 misc Status report Tue 12/22 6:58 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 12:48 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/08 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 06, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/06 1:50 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From November 10, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than December 7, 2020 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/6/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
6 6 misc Status report Tue 10/27 8:00 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 10/13 9:25 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:50 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 10:02 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:28 PM
Summons Issued on Dynamics Orthotics & Prosthetics, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 11:27 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01267. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Dynamics Orthotics & Prosthetics, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01267-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639228. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1