Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01271
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
ECRI Institute
5200 Butler Pike
Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462
Represented By
ECRI Institute
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 7:39 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1271 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Friday, February 26, 2021
13 13 notice Notice Fri 02/26 6:38 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 12:05 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
10 10 misc Status report Tue 12/22 6:54 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 12:49 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 08, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/08 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/08/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 06, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/06 2:06 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From November 10, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than December 7, 2020 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/6/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
6 6 misc Status report Wed 10/21 11:49 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 15, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 10/15 8:38 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:52 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 10:04 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 4:03 PM
Summons Issued on ECRI Institute Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 11:39 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01271. Complaint by Verity Health System of California, Inc. against ECRI Institute. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01271-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639228. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1