Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01274
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Emerald Textiles, LLC
675 Beach Drive
Watsonville, CA 95076
Represented By
Emerald Textiles, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 8:54 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1274 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein,7 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/14 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 12, 2021
24 24 2 pgs order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Mon 04/12 6:26 PM
Default Judgment In Favor Of Plaintiff (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/12/2021. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, April 08, 2021
23 23 misc Declaration Thu 04/08 9:02 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1
Att: 1 Order
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 02/23 12:21 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 21 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
Thursday, February 18, 2021
21 21 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 02/18 2:42 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Saturday, February 13, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/13 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 11, 2021
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 02/11 12:24 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/11/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, February 04, 2021
18 18 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 02/04 6:06 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to MediClean Linen&Laundry Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
17 17 misc Status report Tue 02/02 6:50 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
16 16 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 9:44 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
14 14 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 12:22 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than January 31, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
13 13 misc Status report Tue 12/15 1:12 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 15, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/15 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/15 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
10 10 misc Proof of service Tue 10/13 7:06 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint,6 Summons Issued,7 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF),8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 09, 2020
9 9 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 10/09 8:12 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/09 8:10 PM
Order re Courtroom Procedures. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/9/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Fri 10/09 7:53 PM
Scheduling Order re6 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/9/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Discovery due by 1/4/2022. Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Summons Issued Fri 10/09 7:22 PM
Summons Issued on MediClean Linen&Laundry Inc. Date Issued 10/9/2020, Answer Due 11/9/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/07 11:19 AM
Amended Complaint by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Howard Grobstein against MediClean Linen&Laundry Inc.. Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01274. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Emerald Textiles, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 7:54 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 10:06 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 4:06 PM
Summons Issued on Emerald Textiles, LLC Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 11:47 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01274. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Emerald Textiles, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01274-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639228. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1