Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01284
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.
920 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451
Represented By
Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 01, 2021
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/01 10:51 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1284 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Tue 01/12 8:24 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 10, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 01/10 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 08, 2021
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 01/08 9:03 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 19, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/8/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
9 9 notice Notice Tue 01/05 9:05 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
8 8 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 10/15 8:52 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Sunday, September 27, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 09/27 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, September 25, 2020
6 6 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 09/25 4:57 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between St. Francis Medical Center And Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. Regarding The Hearings, Dates And Deadlines Assigned To This Adversary Proceeding By Order Establishing Procedures For The Issuance Of Scheduling Orders And Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures In Connection With Avoidance Actions (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/25/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, September 24, 2020
5 5 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 09/24 10:59 AM
Stipulation By Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. and St. Francis Medical Center Filed by Defendant Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. (Rougeau, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 8:00 AM
Proof of service (Amended) Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 3 Proof of service
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Thu 09/10 10:11 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 4:11 PM
Summons Issued on Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 12:19 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01284. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01284-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639228. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1