Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01295
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Greg Owens Construction, Inc
837 University Avenue
Burbank, CA 91504
Represented By
Greg Owens Construction, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
17 17 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Wed 03/24 7:56 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Document was filed on a closed case. The court will not take any action on this document. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice filed by Defendant Greg Owens Construction, Inc
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
16 16 notice Notice Tue 03/23 3:59 PM
Notice Requesting Termination from Electronic and Other Noticing, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Greg Owens Construction, Inc. (Steinberg, Peter) WARNING: See entry 17 for corrective action. Document was filed on a closed case. The court will not take any action on this document. Modified on 3/24/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 7:32 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1295 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
14 14 notice Notice Tue 02/09 1:27 PM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 30, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/30 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 28, 2021
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/28 3:53 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/28/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
11 11 misc Status report Tue 01/19 10:30 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
10 10 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:15 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 07, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 11/07 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, November 05, 2020
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 11/05 11:54 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 10, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/5/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
7 7 misc Status report Tue 10/27 7:59 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, October 09, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 10/09 8:31 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) WARNING: Duplicate of entry 5 . Modified on 10/9/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 10/09 8:29 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Monday, September 28, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 9:46 AM
Answer to Complaint Answer with Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Greg Owens Construction, Inc. to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502; with Proof of Service Filed by Greg Owens Construction, Inc. (Steinberg, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 9:52 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Thursday, September 03, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 09/03 10:53 AM
Summons Issued on Greg Owens Construction, Inc Date Issued 9/3/2020, Answer Due 10/5/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 12:43 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01295. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Greg Owens Construction, Inc. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01295-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639228. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1