Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01298
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Apr 15, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Healthcare Cost Solutions, Inc.
1200 Newport Center Drive Suite 190
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
Healthcare Cost Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Business Services
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 15, 2021
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/15 10:41 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1298 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Thursday, March 18, 2021
13 13 notice Notice Thu 03/18 9:38 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 30, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/30 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 28, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/28 3:51 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/28/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Tue 01/19 10:28 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:17 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/22 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 20, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/20 4:13 PM
Order: (1) Setting Continued Status Conference For February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Overruling Defendant's Objection To The Bankruptcy Court's Entry Of Final Judgment (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/20/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 11/10 1:05 PM
Hearing Held re Status Hearing RE:1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01298. Complaint by Verity BusinessServices against Healthcare Cost Solutions, Inc. - A continued Status Conference is set for February 2,2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Mon 11/09 1:32 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, October 19, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 10/19 12:13 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 9/27/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Monday, September 14, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 9:56 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 6:28 PM
Summons Issued on Healthcare Cost Solutions, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 12:55 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01298. Complaint by Verity Business Services against Healthcare Cost Solutions, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/27 3:16 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01298-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51639228. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1