Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01300
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
HIM Services, LLC
736 N. Western Avenue # 152
Lake Forest, IL 60045
Represented By
HIM Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 8:59 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1300 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/14 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 12, 2021
17 17 2 pgs order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Mon 04/12 6:16 PM
Default Judgment In Favor Of Plaintiff (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/12/2021. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, April 08, 2021
16 16 misc Declaration Thu 04/08 8:57 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1
Att: 1 Order
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 02/23 12:13 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, February 18, 2021
14 14 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 02/18 2:33 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, February 05, 2021
13 13 misc Withdrawal re: Fri 02/05 3:54 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice Of Withdrawal of Docket Number 12 Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 12 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Thursday, February 04, 2021
12 12 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 02/04 5:57 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to HIM Services, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Saturday, January 30, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/30 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/30/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 28, 2021
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/28 3:48 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/28/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Wed 01/13 9:33 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:17 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/22 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, November 19, 2020
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 11/19 8:11 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than December 31, 2020 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/19/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Tue 11/17 12:31 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, October 19, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 10/19 12:18 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Monday, September 14, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 9:58 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 7:53 PM
Summons Issued on HIM Services, LLC Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 1:12 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01300. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against HIM Services, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet