Seton Medical Center v. ISI Inspection Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01312 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ISI Inspection Services, Inc.
1798 University Avenue
Berkeley, CA 94703 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/05 10:09 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1312 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Saturday, November 21, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/21/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/19/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Thu 10/15 9:16 PM
Hearing Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on ISI Inspection Services, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01312. Complaint by Seton Medical Center against ISI Inspection Services, Inc. Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |