Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01323
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
LEARN Speech Therapy
662 Hazel Dell Road
Corralitos, CA 95076
Represented By
LEARN Speech Therapy
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 7:27 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1323 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Louise Regional Hospital
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
11 11 notice Notice Tue 02/09 11:49 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
10 10 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:24 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Louise Regional Hospital. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/22 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 20, 2020
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/20 12:14 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/20/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
7 7 misc Status report Tue 11/17 12:34 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Louise Regional Hospital Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 15, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 10/15 9:22 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Louise Regional Hospital
Monday, September 28, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Mon 09/28 2:09 PM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant LEARN Speech Therapy Related [+]. (Lewicki, Alexander)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 11:44 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by LEARN Speech Therapy. (Lewicki, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Mon 09/14 3:30 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Louise Regional Hospital Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:11 PM
Summons Issued on LEARN Speech Therapy Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Louise Regional Hospital
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 2:11 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01323. Complaint by St. Louise Regional Hospital against LEARN Speech Therapy. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet