St. Francis Medical Center v. Linde Gas North America LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01326 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Linde Gas North America LLC
10 Riverview Drive
Danbury, CT 06810 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/01 3:05 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1326 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Linde Gas North America LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01326. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Linde Gas North America LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |