Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01334
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Jul 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.
7227 Lee Deforest Drive
Columbia, MD 21046
Represented By
Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/21 10:16 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1334 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
17 17 notice Notice Wed 07/21 9:46 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 07/14 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, July 12, 2021
15 15 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 07/12 9:39 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To October 12, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/12/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, July 08, 2021
14 14 notice Notice Thu 07/08 12:55 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
13 13 misc Status report Mon 06/28 1:53 PM
Status report Filed by Defendant Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. Related [+]. (Hilton, Lawrence)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Sunday, March 21, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/21 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, March 19, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 03/19 3:23 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/19/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, March 05, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Fri 03/05 6:23 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:26 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/22 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 20, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/20 9:20 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/20/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
6 6 misc Status report Tue 11/17 12:25 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 15, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 10/15 9:29 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Monday, September 28, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 1:27 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Filed by Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Hilton, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 8:03 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:18 PM
Summons Issued on Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 2:45 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01334. Complaint by Seton Medical Center against Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet