Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01336
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Oct 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Healthpeak Properties, Inc.
1920 Main Street Suite 1200
Irvine, CA 92614
Represented By
Healthpeak Properties, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
5 5 court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/07 7:35 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1336 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
4 4 notice Notice Wed 10/07 12:07 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 11:57 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 7:36 AM
Summons Issued on Healthpeak Properties, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 2:55 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01336. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against Healthpeak Properties, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet