Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01341
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Jan 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Medacta USA, Inc.
6640 Carothers Parkway Suite 420
Franklin, TN 37067
Represented By
Medacta USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/05 10:13 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1341 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
14 14 notice Notice Tue 12/22 7:23 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
13 13 misc Voluntary Dismissal of Motion Wed 12/16 10:21 AM
Voluntary Dismissal of Motion (already filed and granted) Filed by Defendant Medacta USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Esterkin, Richard)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice (Laura McCarthy)
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
12 12 motion Appear pro hac vice (motion) Tue 12/15 4:55 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice (Laura McCarthy) Filed by Defendant Medacta USA, Inc. (Esterkin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
11 11 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:28 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 12/02 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/02/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 30, 2020
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF) Mon 11/30 9:36 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice re Laura McCarthy, Esq. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/30/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
8 8 motion Appear pro hac vice (motion) Tue 11/24 3:39 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice (Laura McCarthy) Filed by Defendant Medacta USA, Inc. (Esterkin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/22 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 20, 2020
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/20 12:11 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/20/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Tue 11/17 12:33 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, October 15, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 10/15 9:31 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 12:00 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:20 PM
Summons Issued on Medacta USA, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 3:56 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01341. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Medacta USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet