Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01345
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Medical Solutions, Inc.
3901 Centerview Drive Suite L
Chantilly, VA 20151
Represented By
Medical Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 9:02 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1345 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
10 10 notice Notice Fri 03/05 6:11 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:30 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/22 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 20, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/20 11:19 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/20/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
6 6 misc Status report Tue 11/17 1:25 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, November 02, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/02 3:32 PM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 549 and 550 and to Disallow Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Medical Solutions, Inc.. (McCarthy, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 9:50 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 12:19 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:24 PM
Summons Issued on Medical Solutions, Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 4:34 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01345. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Medical Solutions, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet