Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01346
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Medicity LLC
3165 Millrock Drive Suite 400
Salt Lake City, UT 84121
Represented By
Medicity LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 01, 2021
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/01 10:56 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1346 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Wed 01/20 10:37 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
11 11 misc Proof of service Tue 12/08 9:33 AM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant Medicity LLC. (Stoian, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
10 10 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:31 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/25 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 23, 2020
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 11/23 1:01 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Overruling Defendant's Objection To The Bankruptcy Court's Entry Of Final Judgment (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
7 7 misc Status report Tue 11/17 12:39 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, October 30, 2020
6 6 misc Proof of service Fri 10/30 3:56 PM
Proof of service of Answer with Affirmative Defenses Filed by Defendant Medicity LLC Related [+]. (Stoian, Rachel)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 10/30 2:19 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/30 12:40 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Medicity LLC. (Stoian, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 12:20 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 7:45 AM
Summons Issued on Medicity LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc.
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 4:41 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01346. Complaint by Verity Health System of California, Inc. against Medicity LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet