Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01349
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
MGA Home Healthcare, L.L.C.
7025 North Scottsdale Road Suite 200
Scottsdale, AZ 85253
Represented By
MGA Home Healthcare, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, February 01, 2021
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/01 10:56 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1349 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Friday, January 22, 2021
10 10 notice Notice Fri 01/22 9:09 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Tue 01/19 8:21 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, December 03, 2020
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 12/03 1:32 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/25 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 23, 2020
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 11/23 11:30 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 1, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 11/17 5:03 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 10/25/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
4 4 misc Status report Tue 11/17 12:27 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 12:22 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 7:52 AM
Summons Issued on MGA Home Healthcare, L.L.C. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 5:27 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01349. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital against MGA Home Healthcare, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet