Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01351
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Dec 01, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
MIREF Century, LLC
550 South Winchester Boulevard
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
MIREF Century, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/01 5:42 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1351 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation,7 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
13 13 notice Notice Tue 11/17 1:49 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/04 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/04 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 02, 2020
10 10 misc Proof of service Mon 11/02 11:59 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Another Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Another Summons Issued,7 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF),8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 30, 2020
9 9 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 10/30 7:16 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 7:14 PM
Order Re: Courtroom Procedures. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/30/2020 Related [+]. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
7 7 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 7:13 PM
Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/30/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Discovery due by 4/5/2022. Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
6 6 court Another Summons Issued Thu 10/29 6:40 PM
Another Summons Issued on MIREF Century, LLC Date Issued 10/29/2020, Answer Due 11/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
5 5 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Tue 10/27 10:01 AM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 9:47 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 1:09 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:42 PM
Summons Issued on MIREF Century, LLC Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 5:57 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01351. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against MIREF Century, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet