Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01358
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Sep 30, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Neuroscience Institute of Northern California
2520 Samaritan Drive Suite 104B
San Jose, CA 95124
Represented By
Neuroscience Institute of Northern California
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 30, 2021
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/30 11:21 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1358 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
18 18 notice Notice Thu 09/30 10:26 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 12, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 09/12 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Friday, September 10, 2021
16 16 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Fri 09/10 8:22 AM
Order to continue status conference from SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 TO DECEMBER 14, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M. in view of settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/10/2021 (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
15 15 notice Notice Tue 09/07 8:01 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 06/09 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Monday, June 07, 2021
13 13 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 06/07 9:49 AM
Order continuing status conference from June 8, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. to September 14, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. in view of settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/7/2021 (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Tue 05/25 8:13 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 13, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/13 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 11, 2021
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 02/11 2:07 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/11/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Tue 02/02 6:52 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 11:33 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
7 7 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 12/08 1:25 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Friday, December 04, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/04 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
5 5 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/02 4:21 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From December 8, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than January 8, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, November 20, 2020
4 4 misc Status report Fri 11/20 11:15 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 1:18 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 8:47 AM
Summons Issued on Neuroscience Institute of Northern California Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 7:13 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01358. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against Neuroscience Institute of Northern California. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet