Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01365
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Orthosport Inc.
121 East 38th Street Suite 101
Garden City, ID 83714
Represented By
Orthosport Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 9:17 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1365 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, April 15, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/15 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 12, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Mon 04/12 6:34 PM
Default Judgment In Favor Of Plaintiff (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/12/2021. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, April 08, 2021
15 15 misc Declaration Thu 04/08 9:05 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1
Att: 1 Order
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 02/23 12:23 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
Thursday, February 18, 2021
13 13 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 02/18 2:45 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Saturday, February 13, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/13 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 11, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 02/11 2:34 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/11/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, February 04, 2021
10 10 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 02/04 6:10 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Orthosport Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Tue 02/02 6:54 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 11:39 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/04 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/02 4:13 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From December 8, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than January 8, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, November 20, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Fri 11/20 11:13 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 9:37 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 1:27 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 28, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/28 5:54 PM
Summons Issued on Orthosport Inc. Date Issued 8/28/2020, Answer Due 9/28/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 7:47 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01365. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against Orthosport Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet