Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01375
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pepperdine University
24255 Pacific Coast Highway
Mailbu, CA 90263
Represented By
Pepperdine University
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 01, 2021
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/01 10:58 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1375 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, January 21, 2021
8 8 notice Notice Thu 01/21 7:47 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/04 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/02 12:58 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 8, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, November 20, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Fri 11/20 11:17 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 9:30 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 1:39 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 11:42 AM
Summons Issued on Pepperdine University Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 8:51 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01375. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Pepperdine University. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet