Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01378
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Nov 25, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Photon Physics Services
15 Encanto Drive
Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274
Represented By
Photon Physics Services
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/25 8:25 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1378 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Friday, November 20, 2020
6 6 notice Notice Fri 11/20 11:10 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 11/04 8:03 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/03 4:58 PM
Answer to Complaint [to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 549 and 550 and to Disallow Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502] Filed by Photon Physics Services. (McCarthy, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 1:48 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:03 AM
Summons Issued on Photon Physics Services Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 9:20 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01378. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Photon Physics Services. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet