Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01380
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2020
Terminated:Jan 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC
2125 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 200
Walnut Creek, CA 94598
Represented By
Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 01, 2021
15 15 notice Notice Mon 03/01 9:01 AM
Notice Requesting Termination of Electronic Mailing List Filed by Defendant Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC. (Lawton, Dan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/05 10:16 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1380 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, 10 Hearing (Adv Other) Set
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
13 13 notice Notice Tue 12/29 8:24 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/04 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
11 11 motion Summary Judgment (motion) Fri 12/04 10:20 AM
Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC (Lawton, Dan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Att: 2 Proposed Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law
Att: 3 Declaration of Michael Reever
Att: 4 Proposed Order re Summary Judgment
10 10 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 12/04 9:56 AM
Hearing Set re8 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing to be held on 1/20/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 12/04 9:52 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT "Summary Judgment (motion)". Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of motion/application filed by Defendant Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC
Thursday, December 03, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of motion/application Thu 12/03 3:31 PM
Notice of motion/application for Summary Judgment (with Proof of Service) Filed by Defendant Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC.(Lawton, Dan) WARNING: See docket entry 9 for corrective action; Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT "Summary Judgment (motion)"; Modified on 12/4/2020 (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Att: 2 Proposed Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law
Att: 3 Declaration of Michael Reever
Att: 4 Proposed Order re Summary Judgment
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/02 3:50 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 8, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 11/25 8:52 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Tue 11/24 7:33 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/30 5:28 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC. (Lawton, Dan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Tue 09/15 1:50 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:05 AM
Summons Issued on Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/27 9:30 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01380. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet