Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01425
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
KCI USA, Inc.
12930 W Interstate 10
San Antonio, TX 78249
Represented By
KCI USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 5:58 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1425 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Monday, February 22, 2021
25 25 notice Notice Mon 02/22 11:42 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
24 24 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 12:40 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 09, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/09 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
22 22 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Wed 01/06 6:01 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation Extending Deadline For KCI USA, Inc. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By St. Vincent Medical Center, O'connor Hospital, And St. Francis Medical Center (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/6/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 01/06 11:15 AM
Stipulation By KCI USA, Inc. and St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, and St. Francis Medical Center Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/17 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 12/15 4:21 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/15/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
18 18 misc Status report Tue 12/08 10:14 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, December 04, 2020
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/04 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
16 16 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Wed 12/02 2:55 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation Extending Deadline For KCI USA, Inc. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By St. Vincent Medical Center, O'connor Hospital, And St. Francis Medical Center (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 12/02 12:41 PM
Stipulation By KCI USA, Inc. and St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, and St. Francis Medical Center Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/04 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 30, 2020
13 13 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 7:44 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Extending Deadline For KCI Usa, Inc. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By St. Vincent Medical Center, O'connor Hospital, And St. Francis Medical Center (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/30/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, October 29, 2020
12 12 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 10/29 12:04 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation By KCI USA, Inc. and St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, and St. Francis Medical Center Extending Deadline for KCI, USA, Inc. to Respond to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc.
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 10/29 12:00 PM
Stipulation By KCI USA, Inc. and St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, and St. Francis Medical Center Extending Deadline for KCI, USA, Inc. to Respond to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
10 10 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 8:54 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Sunday, September 27, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 09/27 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, September 25, 2020
8 8 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 09/25 5:09 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Extending Deadline For KCI USA, Inc. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By St. Vincent Medical Center, O'connor Hospital, And St. Francis Medical Center (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/25/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 09/25 1:36 PM
Notice of lodgment --Proposed Order Approving Stipulation Extending Deadline for KCI USA, Inc. to Respond to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, and St. Francis Medical Center Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation By KCI USA, Inc. and ASK LLP Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc.
6 6 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 09/25 1:28 PM
Stipulation By KCI USA, Inc. and ASK LLP Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 09/25 1:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice -- Notice of Appearance for KCI USA, Inc. by Paul J Laurin Filed by Defendant KCI USA, Inc.. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 7:49 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 08/31 6:23 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 4:22 PM
Summons Issued on KCI USA, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)CORRECTION: Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM Modified on 8/31/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 3:23 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01425. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center against KCI USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet