Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01430
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Organogenesis, Inc.
85 Dan Road
Canton, MA 02021
Represented By
Organogenesis, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 01, 2021
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/01 10:58 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1430 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
8 8 notice Notice Wed 01/20 10:01 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 19, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/19 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/16 10:12 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 12/08 10:30 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
4 4 misc Status report Tue 12/08 7:10 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 7:54 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 4:09 PM
Summons Issued on Organogenesis, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 3:41 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01430. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center, Saint Louise Regional Hospital against Organogenesis, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet