Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01434
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Apr 15, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
511 Benedict Avenue
Tarrytown, NY 10591
Represented By
Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 15, 2021
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/15 5:52 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1434 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Thursday, March 11, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Thu 03/11 12:18 PM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
11 11 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 12:47 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 19, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/19 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/16 10:23 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
8 8 misc Status report Tue 12/08 10:10 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, October 30, 2020
7 7 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 10/30 10:05 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Siemens Healthineers AG, Siemens Healthineers Beteiligungen GmbH & Co. KG, Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.. (Peo, Valerie)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/30 9:59 AM
Answer to Complaint Answer of Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Filed by Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.. (Peo, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
5 5 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 10/23 7:18 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Miller, Angela. (Miller, Angela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 8:47 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 7:59 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 4:28 PM
Summons Issued on Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 3:55 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01434. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center against Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet