Seton Medical Center et al v. US Foods, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01442 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
US Foods, Inc.
9399 West Higgins Road Suite 500
Rosemont, IL 60018 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/05 10:30 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1442 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Thursday, December 24, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Saturday, December 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Signed on 12/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Wed 10/07 8:43 PM
Hearing Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on US Foods, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01442. Complaint by Seton Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital against US Foods, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |