Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01444
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jan 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
W.W. Grainger, Inc.
100 Grainger Parkway
Lake Forest, IL 60045
Represented By
W.W. Grainger, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/05 10:32 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1444 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
8 8 notice Notice Tue 01/05 9:07 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 19, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/19 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/16 10:53 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, December 04, 2020
5 5 notice Notice Fri 12/04 1:38 PM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 8:40 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 8:33 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 5:03 PM
Summons Issued on W.W. Grainger, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 4:34 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01444. Complaint by Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital against W.W. Grainger, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet