Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01445
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Aug 18, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
South Fork Healthcare, LLC
3738 Foothill Boulevard
La Crescenta, CA 91214
Represented By
South Fork Healthcare, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/18 8:33 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1445 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
19 19 notice Notice Tue 08/03 11:30 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
18 18 misc Withdrawal re: Mon 06/28 2:00 PM
Withdrawal re: Notice of Withdrawal of Docket Number 15 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
17 17 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 06/22 8:07 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT DOCKET EVENT. WARNING: Filer to re-file using correct event code: 'Default Judgment (motion)' . Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.) CORRECTION: Filer not required to re-file document. Correct event code used. Modified on 6/22/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
16 16 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 06/22 6:09 AM
Notice of motion/application Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 07/21/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint and Exhibit) filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
Monday, June 21, 2021
15 15 motion Default Judgment (motion) Mon 06/21 9:37 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 07/21/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint and Exhibit
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 06/09 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Monday, June 07, 2021
13 13 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 06/07 9:28 AM
Order (1) fixing deadline for plaintiff to file motion for default judgment and (2) Continuing status conference from June 8, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M. to November 16, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/7/2021 (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] doc
Saturday, February 13, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/13 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 11, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 02/11 2:47 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/11/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Monday, January 25, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Mon 01/25 1:01 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
9 9 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 12:50 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 19, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/19 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/16 10:56 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than January 22, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, December 04, 2020
6 6 misc Status report Fri 12/04 1:47 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 8:39 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 8:35 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 6:11 PM
Summons Issued on South Fork Healthcare, LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
2 2 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 12:51 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of St. Vincent Medical Center against South Fork Healthcare, LLC. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01445. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against South Fork Healthcare, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 6:28 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01445. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against South Fork Healthcare, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet