Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01446
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jan 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Southern California Crossroads
3680 E. Imperial Highway Suite 405
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Southern California Crossroads
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/05 10:33 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1446 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center,2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
9 9 notice Notice Tue 12/22 7:16 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 19, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/19 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/16 11:01 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From December 22, 2020 At 10:00 A.M. To February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel By No Later Than January 22, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 12/08 10:43 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
5 5 misc Status report Tue 12/08 7:06 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 8:37 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 8:21 PM
Summons Issued on Southern California Crossroads Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 12:54 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of St. Francis Medical Center against Southern California Crossroads. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01446. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Southern California Crossroads. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 6:31 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01446. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against Southern California Crossroads. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet