Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01449
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Oct 27, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
St Francis Radiology Group
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
St Francis Radiology Group
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
8 8 court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/27 2:23 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1449 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center,2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
7 7 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 10/13 10:29 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Trial date set for 1/24/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
6 6 notice Notice Tue 10/13 7:59 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/30 10:45 AM
Answer to Complaint -Answer to Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502; proof of service Filed by St Francis Radiology Group. (Raanan, Uzzi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 8:44 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 8:29 PM
Summons Issued on St Francis Radiology Group Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 2:14 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of St. Francis Medical Center against St Francis Radiology Group. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01449. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against St Francis Radiology Group. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 6:41 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01449. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against St Francis Radiology Group. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet