Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01451
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stanford University Medical Center
500 Pasteur Drive
Stanford, CA 94305
Represented By
Stanford University Medical Center
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 9:37 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1451 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation,14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
19 19 notice Notice Tue 05/04 12:25 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/28 9:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 26, 2021
17 17 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 04/26 12:56 PM
Order Requiring Plaintiff To Provide Additional Notice Of Motion For Default Judgment . Status Conference in this adversary proceeding, set for June 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., shall remain on calendar. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/26/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, April 08, 2021
16 16 misc Declaration Thu 04/08 9:08 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1
Att: 1 Order
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 02/23 12:24 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
Thursday, February 18, 2021
14 14 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 02/18 2:49 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Saturday, February 13, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/13 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 11, 2021
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 02/11 12:31 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/11/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, February 04, 2021
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 02/04 6:14 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Stanford University Medical Center Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Tue 02/02 6:51 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
9 9 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 12:53 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 10:01 AM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than January 31, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
6 6 misc Status report Tue 12/15 1:12 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10/07 7:39 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 8:49 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 6:29 PM
Summons Issued on Stanford University Medical Center Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 1:06 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of Verity Medical Foundation against Stanford University Medical Center. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01451. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against Stanford University Medical Center. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 6:45 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01451. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against Stanford University Medical Center. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet