Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01461
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Oct 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Greeley Company, LLC
5 Cherry Hill Drive Suite 200
Danvers, MA 01923
Represented By
The Greeley Company, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
7 7 court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/07 7:30 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1461 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
6 6 notice Notice Wed 10/07 12:10 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 10/06 5:41 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 9:24 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 6:39 PM
Summons Issued on The Greeley Company, LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 1:22 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of St. Francis Medical Center against The Greeley Company, LLC. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01461. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against The Greeley Company, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 7:04 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01461. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center against The Greeley Company, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet