Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01463
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Oct 17, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
TheraCom, L.L.C.
9717 Key West Avenue
Rockville, MD 20850
Represented By
TheraCom, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 17, 2022
36 36 court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/17 11:25 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1463 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (LG)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Monday, October 10, 2022
35 35 notice Notice Mon 10/10 5:13 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 01, 2022
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 10/01 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 10/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, September 29, 2022
33 33 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 09/29 5:06 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From October 11, 2022 At 10:00 To January 10, 2023 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/29/2022 (LG)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
32 32 notice Notice Tue 09/27 9:10 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
31 31 notice Notice Fri 07/15 7:02 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 07/13 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, July 11, 2022
29 29 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 07/11 10:43 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From July 12, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. To October 11, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. The Pretrial Conference is set for 1/10/2023 at 11:00 a.m. Trial is set for the week of 1/23/2023 at 9:00 am (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/11/2022 (LG)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, June 30, 2022
28 28 misc Status report Thu 06/30 8:06 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 05/11 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, May 09, 2022
26 26 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 05/09 11:50 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From May 10, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. To July 12, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/9/2022 (LG)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
25 25 misc Status report Tue 04/26 1:24 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 03/09 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, March 07, 2022
23 23 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 03/07 11:39 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From March 8, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. To May 10, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. Pretrial Conference is set for August 9, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. Trial is set for the week of August 22, 2022 at 9:00 am (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/7/2022 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/12 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 10, 2022
21 21 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/10 8:33 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 11, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. To March 8, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/10/2022 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/17 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 15, 2021
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 11/15 9:24 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To January 11, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/15/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Monday, November 01, 2021
18 18 misc Status report Mon 11/01 9:20 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, August 06, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 08/06 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
16 16 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 08/04 3:48 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From August 17, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To November 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
15 15 misc Status report Tue 08/03 12:22 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Sunday, April 18, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/18 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 16, 2021
13 13 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/16 3:12 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To August 17, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
12 12 misc Status report Tue 04/06 12:47 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
11 11 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 12:59 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 10:11 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
8 8 misc Status report Tue 12/22 9:37 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
7 7 misc Proof of service Tue 12/01 1:37 PM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant TheraCom, L.L.C. Related [+]. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/01 1:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by TheraCom, L.L.C. . (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 10/06 5:39 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 9:28 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 6:41 PM
Summons Issued on TheraCom, L.L.C. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 1:25 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of Verity Medical Foundation against TheraCom, L.L.C.. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01463. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against TheraCom, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 7:08 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01463. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against TheraCom, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet