Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01467
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jul 15, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Trane U.S. Inc.
800-B Beaty Street
Davidson, NC 28036
Represented By
Trane U.S. Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 15, 2021
23 23 court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/15 11:48 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1467 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center,2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Monday, July 12, 2021
22 22 notice Notice Mon 07/12 9:01 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
21 21 misc Proof of service Mon 04/19 12:33 PM
Proof of service Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Trane U.S. Inc.s, First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 18, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/18 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 16, 2021
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/16 3:16 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To August 17, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
18 18 misc Status report Tue 04/06 12:41 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Friday, February 26, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/26 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 ORDER on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 25, 2021
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/25 4:54 PM
Answer to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502, with Proof of Service Filed by Trane U.S. Inc.. (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Supplemental Thu 02/25 12:49 PM
Supplemental Declaration of Chad V. Haes re: Payment in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Trane U.S. Inc.. (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
14 14 order Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/24 7:54 AM
Order Granting ORDER on application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule re Applicant did not attach a copy of the receipt evidencing payment of the requisite fee (the 'Receipt')) to the Application. Applicant shall file a copy of the Receipt no later than March 4, 2021.(BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/24/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
13 13 misc Declaration Tue 02/23 3:59 PM
Declaration re: of Chad V. Haes re: Payment in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Trane U.S. Inc. Related [+]. (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-] 12 Application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule , with Proof of Service
12 12 motion Non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule (motion) Tue 02/23 3:46 PM
Application of non-resident attorney to appear in a specific case per Local Bankruptcy rule , with Proof of Service Filed by Defendant Trane U.S. Inc. (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
11 11 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 01/26 11:26 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
10 10 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 1:01 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 10:18 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
7 7 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 12/30 11:41 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Coleman, Claudia. (Coleman, Claudia)
Related: [-]
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 12/30 11:32 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Haes, Chad. (Haes, Chad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Tue 12/22 7:02 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 10:08 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:03 PM
Summons Issued on Trane U.S. Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 1:34 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of St. Vincent Medical Center against Trane U.S. Inc.. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01467. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Trane U.S. Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 7:16 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01467. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Trane U.S. Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet