Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01469
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Sep 21, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Transplant Management Group, LLC
11835 Camel Mountain Road #1304-248
San Diego, CA 92128
Represented By
Transplant Management Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/21 11:48 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1469 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center,2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Thursday, September 16, 2021
17 17 notice Notice Thu 09/16 9:45 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 07/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
15 15 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 06/30 4:32 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To October 12, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/30/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
14 14 notice Notice Tue 06/29 7:27 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 27, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 03/27 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, March 25, 2021
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 03/25 10:18 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/25/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
11 11 notice Notice Tue 03/23 6:41 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
10 10 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 11:46 AM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
9 9 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 01/26 11:30 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Saturday, December 19, 2020
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 12/19 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 12/16 11:12 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
6 6 notice Notice Tue 12/15 11:00 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/28 4:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Transplant Management Group, LLC. (Leeds, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 10:12 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:28 PM
Summons Issued on Transplant Management Group, LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 1:37 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of St. Vincent Medical Center against Transplant Management Group, LLC. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01469. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Transplant Management Group, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 7:20 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01469. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center against Transplant Management Group, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet