Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01474
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc.
11411 Brookshire Avenue Suite 101
Downey, CA 90241
Represented By
United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
20 20 notice Notice Wed 06/29 12:18 PM
Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 17 Default Judgment In Favor Of Plaintiff (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc14 ) Signed on 4/12/2021. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Thursday, May 06, 2021
19 19 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 9:43 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1474 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, April 15, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/15 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 12, 2021
17 17 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Mon 04/12 6:40 PM
Default Judgment In Favor Of Plaintiff (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/12/2021. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, April 08, 2021
16 16 misc Declaration Thu 04/08 9:10 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1
Att: 1 Order
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of motion/application Tue 02/23 12:26 PM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein
Thursday, February 18, 2021
14 14 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 02/18 3:02 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgement Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Default Judgment Motion due by 03/22/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Saturday, February 13, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/13 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, February 11, 2021
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 02/11 12:49 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/11/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, February 04, 2021
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 02/04 6:16 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Tue 02/02 6:59 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
9 9 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 1:06 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 10:42 AM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To February 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than January 31, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
6 6 misc Status report Tue 12/22 9:36 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 10/06 5:29 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Thursday, September 17, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 09/17 10:19 AM
Proof of service of Amended Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 6:54 PM
Summons Issued on United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/31 1:43 PM
Amended Complaint by Tania M Moyron on behalf of Verity Medical Foundation against United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc.. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01474. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 7:37 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01474. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation against United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet