St. Francis Medical Center et al v. Agiliti Health, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01494 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Agiliti Health, Inc.
6625 West 78th Street Suite 300
Minneapolis, MN 55439 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/15 5:26 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1494 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Agiliti Health, Inc.. (Blakeley, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Status report Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Tue 10/06 5:11 PM
Hearing Set Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Friday, September 18, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Scott E Blakeley Filed by Defendant Agiliti Health, Inc.. (Blakeley, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 31, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Agiliti Health, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) |
|
Saturday, August 29, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01494-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01494. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center, Seton Medical Center against Agiliti Health, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |