Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01497
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Company
200 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10285
Represented By
American Express Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/16 11:01 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1497 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Monday, April 26, 2021
15 15 notice Notice Mon 04/26 8:18 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 18, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/18 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 16, 2021
13 13 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/16 3:42 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To August 17, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/16/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
12 12 misc Status report Tue 04/06 12:42 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
11 11 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 1:48 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 11:53 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
8 8 misc Status report Tue 12/22 7:07 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs Verity Health System of California, Inc., Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, December 21, 2020
7 7 misc Notice of Change of Address Mon 12/21 6:11 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Defendant American Express Company. (Kelly, Sweeney)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 10/30 3:45 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
5 5 misc Statement Fri 10/30 2:01 PM
Statement Corporate Disclosure Filed by Defendant American Express Company. (Sweeney, Kelly)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/30 1:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by American Express Company. (Sweeney, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 8:43 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs Verity Health System of California, Inc., Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 10:13 PM
Summons Issued on American Express Company Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01497-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 8:48 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01497. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation, Verity Health System of California, Inc. against American Express Company. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet