Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01499
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Argon Medical Devices, Inc.
2600 Dallas Parkway Suite 440
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Argon Medical Devices, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 5:08 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1499 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Monday, February 22, 2021
11 11 notice Notice Mon 02/22 11:34 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/29 4:44 PM
Answer to Complaint Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Argon Medical Devices, Inc.. (Andrassy, Kyra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
9 9 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 01/26 11:43 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Wed 01/13 1:49 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/06 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, January 04, 2021
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Mon 01/04 2:04 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Andrassy, Kyra. (Andrassy, Kyra)
Related: [-]
5 5 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/04 11:56 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 5, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
4 4 misc Status report Tue 12/22 6:59 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 8:46 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 10:19 PM
Summons Issued on Argon Medical Devices, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01499-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 8:53 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01499. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center against Argon Medical Devices, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet