Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01518
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Aug 18, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
CSI General Contracting Inc.
4195 Chino Hills Parkway Suite 544
Chino Hills, CA 91709
Represented By
CSI General Contracting Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Business Services
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Saturday, August 28, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 08/29 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 08/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, August 26, 2021
20 20 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 08/26 12:16 PM
Order Approving Request To Vacate Judgment Of Default Against CSI General Contracting Inc. And Dismiss Adversary Complaint With Prejudice (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/26/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Thu 08/26 6:01 AM
Motion Request to Vacate Judgement of Default Against CSI General Contracting Inc. and Dismiss Adversary Complaint with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/18 4:06 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1518 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Saturday, July 17, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 07/17 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, July 15, 2021
16 16 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Thu 07/15 4:08 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/15/2021. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 07/14 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, July 12, 2021
14 14 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 07/12 10:07 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To October 12, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/12/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
13 13 misc Declaration Mon 07/12 8:54 AM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, June 24, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of motion/application Thu 06/24 6:01 AM
Notice of motion/application Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 07/23/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint & Exhibits) filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
11 11 motion Default Judgment (motion) Wed 06/23 7:43 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 07/23/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint & Exhibits
Sunday, March 21, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/21 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, March 19, 2021
9 9 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 03/19 3:21 PM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/19/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, March 05, 2021
8 8 misc Status report Fri 03/05 6:18 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, January 15, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/15 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/13 10:37 AM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From January 19, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than February 19, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 12/29 10:42 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 3/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Business Services
4 4 misc Status report Tue 12/29 8:13 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, Verity Business Services Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 9:22 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, Verity Business Services Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/01 11:59 AM
Summons Issued on CSI General Contracting Inc. Date Issued 9/1/2020, Answer Due 10/1/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01518-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 9:59 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01518. Complaint by Verity Business Services, Seton Medical Center against CSI General Contracting Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet