O'Connor Hospital et al v. Edwards Lifesciences LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ernest M Robles |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-01520 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Edwards Lifesciences LLC
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/01 8:11 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1520 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Withdrawal of Docket Number 4. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center . (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 01, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Edwards Lifesciences LLC Date Issued 9/1/2020, Answer Due 10/1/2020 Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria) |
|
Saturday, August 29, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01520-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:20-ap-01520. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center against Edwards Lifesciences LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |