Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01537
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Dec 01, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Liberty Fire Systems Inc.
3182 Campus Drive Suite 136
San Mateo, CA 94403
Represented By
Liberty Fire Systems Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Holdings, LLC
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
5 5 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/01 7:21 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1537 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Thursday, November 05, 2020
4 4 notice Notice Thu 11/05 9:00 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, Verity Holdings, LLC. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 9:57 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, Verity Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/01 2:56 PM
Summons Issued on Liberty Fire Systems Inc. Date Issued 9/1/2020, Answer Due 10/1/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01537-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 10:55 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01537. Complaint by Verity Holdings, LLC, Seton Medical Center against Liberty Fire Systems Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet