Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01542
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jan 11, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation
125 May Street Suite 300
Edison, NJ 08837
Represented By
Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 01/12 9:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/12/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/11 12:42 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1542 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
19 19 notice Notice Tue 01/11 11:37 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
18 18 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 01/10 8:25 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 11, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. To April 12, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/10/2022 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Sunday, October 10, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 10/10 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 10/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 08, 2021
16 16 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/08 11:49 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From October 12, 2021 To January 11, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/8/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, July 02, 2021
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 07/02 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/02/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
14 14 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 06/30 4:46 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To October 12, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/30/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
13 13 notice Notice Tue 06/29 7:26 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/08 7:02 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation. (Mulligan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 03/24 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, March 22, 2021
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 03/22 8:15 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/22/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Tue 03/09 12:00 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, February 18, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:12 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/15 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/13 11:50 AM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From January 19, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To March 23, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than February 19, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
5 5 misc Status report Tue 12/29 8:15 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary) WARNING: Correct date for status hearing is 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM; Modified on 12/29/2020 (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, October 05, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 10/05 9:42 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 3/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:03 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 8:47 PM
Summons Issued on Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01542-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 11:09 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01542. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center against Musculoskeletal Transplant Foundation. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet