Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01544
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Norcal Mutual Insurance Company
1700 Bent Creek Boulevard
Mechanicsburg, PA 17050
Represented By
Norcal Mutual Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 01, 2021
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/01 11:03 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1544 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Monday, January 18, 2021
10 10 notice Notice Mon 01/18 7:01 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/15 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
8 8 misc Proof of service Fri 01/15 12:23 PM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant Norcal Mutual Insurance Company Related [+]. (Young, Bennett)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/15 12:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Defendant Norcal Mutual Insurance Company's Answer to Complaint Filed by Norcal Mutual Insurance Company. (Young, Bennett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/13 11:53 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 19, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 4, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
5 5 misc Status report Tue 01/05 9:23 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, October 05, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 10/05 9:40 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 3/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:08 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 8:49 PM
Summons Issued on Norcal Mutual Insurance Company Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01544-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 11:15 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01544. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center against Norcal Mutual Insurance Company. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet