Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01546
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
NuVasive, Inc.
7475 Lusik Boulevard
San Diego, CA 92121
Represented By
NuVasive, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/05 9:10 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1546 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
9 9 notice Notice Fri 03/05 6:15 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:13 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
7 7 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 02/02 7:14 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 3/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Sunday, January 10, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 01/10 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 08, 2021
5 5 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 01/08 9:09 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 19, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/8/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
4 4 notice Notice Tue 01/05 9:35 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:12 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/01 3:17 PM
Summons Issued on NuVasive, Inc. Date Issued 9/1/2020, Answer Due 10/1/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:14 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01546-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650357. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 11:20 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01546. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center against NuVasive, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet