Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01549
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Otis Elevator Company
One Carrier Place
Farmington, CT 06032
Represented By
Otis Elevator Company
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
25 25 notice Notice Wed 04/06 8:42 AM
Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 22 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trusteefor the VHS Liquidating Trust and against Defendant Otis Elevator Company (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc18 ) Signed on 5/24/2021.
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/16 11:09 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1549 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center,6 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 05/26 9:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Monday, May 24, 2021
22 22 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Mon 05/24 11:27 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trusteefor the VHS Liquidating Trust and against Defendant Otis Elevator Company (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/24/2021. (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
21 21 misc Declaration Tue 05/18 12:03 PM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, April 22, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of motion/application Thu 04/22 6:59 AM
Notice of motion/application Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default Judgement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 05/20/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint w/ exhibits) filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/21 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
18 18 motion Default Judgment (motion) Tue 04/20 9:28 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 05/20/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint w/ exhibits
Monday, April 19, 2021
17 17 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 04/19 7:53 AM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To August 17, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/19/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
16 16 misc Status report Tue 03/30 10:13 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, February 18, 2021
15 15 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:14 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/29 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
13 13 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/27 3:23 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than March 5, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/27/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
12 12 misc Status report Wed 01/13 9:34 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, November 02, 2020
11 11 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 11/02 2:23 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
10 10 misc Proof of service Mon 11/02 11:56 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Another Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Another Summons Issued,6 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF),7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Sunday, November 01, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/01 8:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/01 8:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 30, 2020
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 3:54 PM
Order Re: Courtroom Procedures; (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/30/2020 Related [+]. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
6 6 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Fri 10/30 3:53 PM
Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 10/30/2020. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Discovery due by 4/5/2022. Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Another Summons Issued Fri 10/30 3:52 PM
Another Summons Issued on Otis Elevator Company Date Issued 10/30/2020, Answer Due 11/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
4 4 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Tue 10/27 9:57 AM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:16 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/01 3:26 PM
Summons Issued on Otis Elevator Company Date Issued 9/1/2020, Answer Due 10/1/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:16 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01549-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650428. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 11:27 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01549. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center against Otis Elevator Company. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet