Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01551
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Paragon 28, Inc.
14445 Grasslands Drive
Englewood, CO 80112
Represented By
Paragon 28, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 9:56 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1551 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center,11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
14 14 3 pgs notice Notice Tue 05/04 12:24 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
13 13 5 pgs notice Notice of motion/application Thu 04/08 6:41 AM
Notice of motion/application Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 05/6/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Summons # 2 Complaint # 3 Proposed Order)
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/07 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
11 11 5 pgs motion Default Judgment (motion) Tue 04/06 12:16 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Default Judgment Motion due by 05/6/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Complaint
Att: 3 2 pgs Proposed Order
Monday, April 05, 2021
10 10 2 pgs order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 04/05 9:45 AM
Order: (1) Entering Defendant's Default And (2) Continuing Status Conference From April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To July 13, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/5/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Tue 03/23 11:10 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, February 18, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:15 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/22 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/22/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/20 1:33 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 6, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than February 26, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/20/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
5 5 5 pgs misc Status report Tue 01/12 8:55 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, October 05, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 10/05 9:36 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:18 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 8:59 PM
Summons Issued on Paragon 28, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:16 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01551-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650428. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 11:33 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01551. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center against Paragon 28, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 2 pgs Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet